U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:15-cr-50123-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hagedorn
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
June, 2019
  • June 20, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • June 13, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • June 04, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • April 10, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 10, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • April 10, 2019: [Terminate Hearings]
  • April 09, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • April 05, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • April 05, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 05, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 05, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 05, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • April 05, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
June, 2018
  • June 13, 2018: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 12, 2018: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
June, 2017
  • June 12, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • June 12, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 12, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • June 05, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 05, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 05, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
April, 2017
  • April 24, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 24, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 21, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2017
  • March 14, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 08, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • February 24, 2017: [Consent]
  • February 24, 2017: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • February 24, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 22, 2017: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
January, 2017
  • January 30, 2017: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • January 30, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 30, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 30, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 17, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 10, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2016
  • December 21, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 20, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 13, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2016
  • November 21, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 21, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 15, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2016
  • October 19, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 12, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2016
  • September 16, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 06, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2016
  • August 15, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 15, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 05, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2016
  • July 07, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
June, 2016
  • June 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 27, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2016
  • May 03, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 02, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2016
  • March 11, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 04, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 01, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2016
  • January 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 26, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 19, 2016: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • January 05, 2016: [Request]
  • January 05, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 04, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 04, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 04, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
December, 2015
  • December 31, 2015: [Invocation of Rights]
  • December 31, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • December 31, 2015: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 31, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 31, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 31, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • December 31, 2015: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 31, 2015: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 30, 2015: [Bail Report]
  • December 30, 2015: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 30, 2015: [Arrest]
  • December 30, 2015: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 30, 2015: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.