U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:15-cr-50153-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bruce
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 22, 2021: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
May, 2021
  • May 10, 2021: [Order re Exhibits]
March, 2021
  • March 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • March 08, 2021: [Forfeiture]
  • March 08, 2021: [Declaration of Publication]
April, 2020
  • April 01, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Forfeiture]
  • March 20, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
August, 2019
  • August 12, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
April, 2019
  • April 26, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • April 25, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • April 18, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 18, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 18, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
March, 2019
  • March 11, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 07, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
February, 2019
  • February 25, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
January, 2019
  • January 09, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 04, 2019: [Consent]
  • January 04, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 04, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • December 19, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • December 19, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 19, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
May, 2018
  • May 16, 2018: [Furlough]
April, 2018
  • April 17, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 10, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2018
  • March 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 18, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 18, 2018: [Continue]
  • January 18, 2018: [Release from Custody]
  • January 17, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 17, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • January 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
June, 2017
  • June 05, 2017: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
May, 2017
  • May 23, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
April, 2017
  • April 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • April 10, 2017: [Furlough]
December, 2016
  • December 21, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 21, 2016: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • December 14, 2016: [Release from Custody]
November, 2016
  • November 16, 2016: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • November 14, 2016: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • November 14, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • November 10, 2016: [Release from Custody]
September, 2016
  • September 28, 2016: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • September 19, 2016: [Response]
  • September 15, 2016: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • September 15, 2016: [Transcript]
June, 2016
  • June 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Bill of Particulars]
  • June 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • June 28, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Count(s)]
  • June 14, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • June 10, 2016: [Extend]
  • June 03, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
May, 2016
  • May 25, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • May 25, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 23, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • May 18, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 11, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 11, 2016: [Bill of Particulars]
April, 2016
  • April 21, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 20, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 19, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 18, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 18, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 14, 2016: [For Order]
  • April 14, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 13, 2016: [For Order]
  • April 13, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 13, 2016: [Dismiss Count]
  • April 12, 2016: [Redacted Document]
  • April 11, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 11, 2016: [Suppress]
January, 2016
  • January 20, 2016: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • January 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 08, 2016: [Request]
  • January 08, 2016: [Continue]
  • January 08, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 08, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • January 04, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
December, 2015
  • December 31, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • December 31, 2015: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • December 31, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • December 31, 2015: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 31, 2015: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 31, 2015: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 31, 2015: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 31, 2015: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 31, 2015: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • December 30, 2015: [Bail Report]
  • December 30, 2015: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 30, 2015: [Arrest]
  • December 30, 2015: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.