U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cr-40113-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ruth-Heffelbower et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
December, 2019
  • December 30, 2019: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
October, 2019
  • October 22, 2019: [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
  • October 07, 2019: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 02, 2019: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
September, 2019
  • September 05, 2019: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 03, 2019: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
April, 2019
  • April 16, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 16, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • April 15, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 12, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • April 10, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 05, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 05, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
March, 2019
  • March 21, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • March 18, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • March 18, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 18, 2019: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • March 15, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • March 15, 2019: [Consent]
  • March 15, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 15, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 15, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • March 15, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
February, 2018
  • February 01, 2018: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • February 01, 2018: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
October, 2017
  • October 27, 2017: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 25, 2017: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
October, 2016
  • October 12, 2016: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • October 11, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • October 05, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
September, 2016
  • September 21, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 21, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • September 20, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • September 15, 2016: [Departure]
  • September 15, 2016: [Variance]
  • September 13, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • September 13, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 13, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 12, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • September 12, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • September 09, 2016: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • September 06, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 06, 2016: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
August, 2016
  • August 29, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 22, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • August 16, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • August 15, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 15, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • August 15, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • August 12, 2016: [Letter]
  • August 09, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 09, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 08, 2016: [Variance]
  • August 08, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • August 08, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 08, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 01, 2016: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
July, 2016
  • July 15, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • July 13, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • July 06, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • July 06, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 06, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 01, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 01, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
June, 2016
  • June 29, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 29, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 29, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 29, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 08, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • June 07, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 07, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 02, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • June 01, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 27, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 27, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 27, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 27, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 25, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2016
  • April 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 11, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 11, 2016: [Continue]
March, 2016
  • March 08, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • March 02, 2016: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 01, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2016
  • February 01, 2016: [Response]
January, 2016
  • January 29, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 29, 2016: [Request]
  • January 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • January 28, 2016: [Discovery]
  • January 26, 2016: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • January 26, 2016: [Discovery]
  • January 20, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 20, 2016: [Order Returning Defendant to State Custody]
  • January 20, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • January 20, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 20, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • January 20, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 20, 2016: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • January 20, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • January 08, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 06, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 06, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 06, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 05, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 05, 2016: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • January 05, 2016: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.