U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:11-cr-30039-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Traversie
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2017
  • March 29, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 28, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2016
  • February 19, 2016: [Order]
  • February 17, 2016: [Proposed Order]
January, 2016
  • January 22, 2016: [Answer of Garnishee]
  • January 08, 2016: [Certificate]
  • January 08, 2016: [Clerk's Notice of Post-Judgment Garnishment]
  • January 08, 2016: [Writ of Continuing Garnishment Issued]
  • January 08, 2016: [Application for Writ of Continuing Garnishment]
  • January 06, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.