U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:15-cv-05093
  • Case Name: Iron Horn v. Chance Casino
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2016
  • March 17, 2016: [USCA Mandate]
  • March 17, 2016: [USCA Judgment]
February, 2016
  • February 08, 2016: [USCA Order (Non-Electronic Record)]
  • February 08, 2016: [USCA Order]
  • February 08, 2016: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
January, 2016
  • January 29, 2016: [Transmittal of Subsequent Filing to 8th Circuit COA]
  • January 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 19, 2016: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • January 15, 2016: [Notice of Appeal]
  • January 15, 2016: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • January 06, 2016: [Order Dismissing Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.