U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:09-cr-10014-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Baker
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 01, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • July 01, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
June, 2019
  • June 20, 2019: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges]
  • June 20, 2019: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • June 14, 2019: [Substitute Attorney ]
May, 2019
  • May 10, 2019: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • May 10, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
April, 2019
  • April 19, 2019: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • April 03, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • March 26, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • March 26, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • March 26, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 26, 2019: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • March 26, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 26, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
February, 2018
  • February 15, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
October, 2017
  • October 13, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 12, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • October 12, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
September, 2017
  • September 26, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 19, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 08, 2017: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • September 08, 2017: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
August, 2017
  • August 28, 2017: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • August 22, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • August 21, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 17, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
  • August 17, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • August 17, 2017: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • August 14, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 11, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 11, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • August 11, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • August 01, 2017: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
May, 2016
  • May 09, 2016: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 09, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
February, 2016
  • February 04, 2016: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • February 04, 2016: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
January, 2016
  • January 27, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 26, 2016: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • January 21, 2016: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • January 21, 2016: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • January 15, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 14, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 13, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 13, 2016: [Report and Recommendations]
  • January 13, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • January 13, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 13, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • January 13, 2016: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 13, 2016: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • January 11, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.