U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cr-40006-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Seda
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 15, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 14, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • October 13, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • October 08, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • September 16, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
September, 2020
  • September 21, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • September 21, 2020: [Revocation of Probation - Final Hearing]
  • September 14, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 14, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • September 08, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • September 02, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • September 02, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • September 02, 2020: [Order]
  • September 02, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • September 02, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 02, 2020: [Consent]
  • September 02, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 02, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • September 01, 2020: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
August, 2020
  • August 28, 2020: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
May, 2018
  • May 10, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 10, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • May 10, 2018: [Revocation of Probation - Final Hearing]
  • May 09, 2018: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 07, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 27, 2018: [Finding of Probable Cause]
  • April 27, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • April 27, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • April 27, 2018: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • April 27, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 24, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 23, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • April 23, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 23, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 23, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • April 13, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • April 13, 2018: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • April 13, 2018: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
November, 2017
  • November 03, 2017: [Request]
August, 2017
  • August 17, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
June, 2017
  • June 21, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 12, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 12, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • June 12, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • June 05, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 05, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 05, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
May, 2017
  • May 22, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 09, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2017
  • March 22, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 22, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 20, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 02, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 02, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 02, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
December, 2016
  • December 15, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 14, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 09, 2016: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • December 08, 2016: [Reconsideration]
  • December 05, 2016: [Order on Ex Parte Motion for Revocation]
  • December 05, 2016: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • December 05, 2016: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
November, 2016
  • November 23, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 18, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
October, 2016
  • October 06, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 06, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 05, 2016: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 05, 2016: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
August, 2016
  • August 16, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 16, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2016
  • June 23, 2016: [Request]
  • June 22, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • June 21, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 21, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 21, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 21, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • June 21, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 20, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • June 16, 2016: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • June 16, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 16, 2016: [Arrest]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • May 16, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • May 16, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
April, 2016
  • April 28, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 27, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • April 26, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 26, 2016: [Continue]
  • April 26, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • April 15, 2016: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • April 14, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 13, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 13, 2016: [Arrest - Other District]
January, 2016
  • January 12, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • January 12, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.