U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cr-40005-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ivy
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2018
  • February 15, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
  • February 06, 2018: [Appeal Record Returned]
January, 2018
  • January 11, 2018: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • January 11, 2018: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
  • January 05, 2018: [USCA Judgment]
  • January 05, 2018: [USCA Opinion]
June, 2017
  • June 02, 2017: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
May, 2017
  • May 30, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Public Transcript for Redaction Purposes]
  • May 30, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • May 30, 2017: [Transcript - Public]
  • May 30, 2017: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • May 30, 2017: [Transcript]
  • May 23, 2017: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
April, 2017
  • April 24, 2017: [USCA Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Transcript]
March, 2017
  • March 28, 2017: [USCA Order]
  • March 27, 2017: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 27, 2017: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • March 21, 2017: [USCA Order]
  • March 10, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • March 07, 2017: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • February 27, 2017: [Court Reporter Information]
  • February 27, 2017: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • February 06, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 06, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • February 06, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • February 06, 2017: [Sentencing]
January, 2017
  • January 30, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 30, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • January 06, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 03, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
November, 2016
  • November 21, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 14, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 14, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 14, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 10, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • November 07, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
October, 2016
  • October 20, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 20, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 19, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 18, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 14, 2016: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
September, 2016
  • September 19, 2016: [Allocution Statement]
  • September 13, 2016: [Bond Hearing]
  • September 13, 2016: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • September 13, 2016: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • September 08, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • September 08, 2016: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 07, 2016: [Furlough]
August, 2016
  • August 15, 2016: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 15, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • August 15, 2016: [Terminate Hearings]
  • August 05, 2016: [Discovery]
  • August 05, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 04, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 04, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 04, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 04, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 01, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2016
  • July 07, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
June, 2016
  • June 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 28, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2016
  • May 26, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 18, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 17, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2016
  • March 17, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 09, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 08, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2016
  • February 09, 2016: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • February 08, 2016: [Discovery]
January, 2016
  • January 29, 2016: [Response]
  • January 20, 2016: [Request]
  • January 20, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 19, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 15, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • January 15, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 14, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • January 14, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 14, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 14, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 14, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • January 14, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 14, 2016: [Arrest]
  • January 14, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 12, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • January 12, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.