U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cr-40013-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Denoyer
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 29, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
October, 2018
  • October 18, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • October 18, 2018: [Continue]
July, 2018
  • July 24, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 24, 2018: [Continue]
May, 2018
  • May 17, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 17, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 17, 2018: [Continue]
  • May 14, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
  • May 14, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • May 14, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
April, 2018
  • April 26, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • April 23, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 23, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 20, 2018: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • April 20, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • April 20, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 20, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 20, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • April 20, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • April 20, 2018: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
July, 2016
  • July 26, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 26, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • July 25, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • July 18, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 18, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
June, 2016
  • June 23, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 15, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
May, 2016
  • May 02, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2016
  • April 29, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • April 29, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 29, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 26, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 22, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 22, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 22, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
March, 2016
  • March 16, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 15, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2016
  • January 22, 2016: [Request]
  • January 22, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 21, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 21, 2016: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • January 21, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • January 21, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 21, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 21, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • January 21, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 21, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • January 13, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 13, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 13, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 12, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • January 12, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.