U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cr-40015-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Stepp-Zafft
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 22, 2020: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • September 22, 2020: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
October, 2018
  • October 05, 2018: [Letter Re Writ of Certiorari]
August, 2018
  • August 23, 2018: [Letter Re Writ of Certiorari]
June, 2018
  • June 05, 2018: [Order on Motion for Return of Property]
  • June 04, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
  • June 01, 2018: [Response to Motion]
May, 2018
  • May 14, 2018: [USCA Judgment]
  • May 14, 2018: [USCA Opinion]
  • May 14, 2018: [Return of Property]
May, 2017
  • May 29, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Public Transcript for Redaction Purposes]
  • May 29, 2017: [Transcript - Public]
  • May 29, 2017: [Transcript - Restricted]
April, 2017
  • April 20, 2017: [USCA Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Transcript]
  • April 03, 2017: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
March, 2017
  • March 30, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • March 15, 2017: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • March 15, 2017: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • March 15, 2017: [Court Reporter Information]
  • March 14, 2017: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • March 07, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 07, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • March 07, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • March 06, 2017: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Supplement]
  • February 21, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • February 21, 2017: [Transcript]
January, 2017
  • January 27, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 25, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 23, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • January 23, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • January 23, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 23, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • January 13, 2017: [Letter(s) of Support]
  • January 10, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 09, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
December, 2016
  • December 23, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
November, 2016
  • November 08, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 07, 2016: [Order Reassigning Case]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • October 28, 2016: [Appoint Counsel]
  • October 20, 2016: [Receipt for Return of Exhibits]
  • October 20, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • October 20, 2016: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • October 20, 2016: [Redacted Document]
  • October 20, 2016: [Verdict]
  • October 20, 2016: [Response]
  • October 20, 2016: [Jury Question]
  • October 20, 2016: [Jury Instructions]
  • October 20, 2016: [Jury Trial - Continuation]
  • October 19, 2016: [Jury List]
  • October 19, 2016: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • October 11, 2016: [In Limine]
  • October 11, 2016: [Notice]
  • October 11, 2016: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • October 07, 2016: [In Limine]
September, 2016
  • September 26, 2016: [Notice]
  • September 26, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 21, 2016: [Order Reassigning Case]
August, 2016
  • August 26, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 24, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • August 24, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 23, 2016: [Continue]
  • August 23, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 11, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • August 10, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • August 10, 2016: [Bond Hearing]
July, 2016
  • July 06, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
June, 2016
  • June 24, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 24, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2016
  • May 23, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • May 23, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 23, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • May 18, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • May 18, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • May 10, 2016: [Oral Order]
  • May 10, 2016: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • May 10, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
April, 2016
  • April 27, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 27, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • April 27, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 11, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 08, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • April 05, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2016
  • March 07, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
February, 2016
  • February 17, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 17, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 01, 2016: [Request]
  • February 01, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
January, 2016
  • January 26, 2016: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • January 26, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 26, 2016: [Order Returning Defendant to State Custody]
  • January 26, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 26, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 26, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 26, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • January 26, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • January 22, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 22, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 21, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 12, 2016: [Indictment]
  • January 12, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.