U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cr-40012-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mikuska
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 03, 2021: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • May 09, 2017: [Judgment Returned Executed]
April, 2017
  • April 11, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 11, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • April 11, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • April 11, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • April 04, 2017: [Sealed Supporting Document(s)]
  • April 04, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 04, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 04, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
March, 2017
  • March 21, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 20, 2017: [Continue]
  • March 06, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 02, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
February, 2017
  • February 21, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
January, 2017
  • January 30, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • January 30, 2017: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • January 05, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 05, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
December, 2016
  • December 21, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 13, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • December 13, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 13, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
October, 2016
  • October 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 19, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • October 18, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2016
  • September 13, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 13, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2016
  • July 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 19, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • July 19, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2016
  • April 22, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 15, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • April 15, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2016
  • March 23, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 22, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • March 22, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 22, 2016: [Discovery]
  • March 09, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 08, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
February, 2016
  • February 09, 2016: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • February 08, 2016: [Discovery]
January, 2016
  • January 29, 2016: [Response]
  • January 22, 2016: [Request]
  • January 22, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 21, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 21, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 20, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 20, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 20, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 20, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 20, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • January 20, 2016: [Arrest]
  • January 20, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • January 20, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 12, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • January 12, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.