U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cr-40008-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ortiz
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2017
  • October 17, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
June, 2017
  • June 14, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 05, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • June 05, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 05, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 05, 2017: [Sentencing]
May, 2017
  • May 25, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 25, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 12, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 05, 2017: [Pre-Sentence Payment]
  • May 01, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2017
  • March 16, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 15, 2017: [Same Day Plea and Sentencing]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 27, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 27, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
January, 2017
  • January 19, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 19, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2016
  • December 22, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 05, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 05, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 05, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
November, 2016
  • November 18, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
October, 2016
  • October 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 28, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2016
  • August 02, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2016
  • May 20, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 20, 2016: [Request]
  • May 19, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 19, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2016
  • April 28, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 27, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • April 15, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 15, 2016: [Request]
  • April 12, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • April 12, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 12, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 12, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 12, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 12, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 12, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • April 12, 2016: [Request]
March, 2016
  • March 22, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 18, 2016: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • March 15, 2016: [Arrest - Other District]
  • March 15, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
January, 2016
  • January 12, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • January 12, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.