U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cr-40007-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Free
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 05, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 05, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • October 05, 2020: [Consent]
June, 2020
  • June 01, 2020: [Status Conference]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 08, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 08, 2020: [Continue]
  • May 05, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [Consent]
  • April 23, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • April 23, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • April 22, 2020: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • April 22, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • April 22, 2020: [Finding of Probable Cause]
  • April 15, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • April 15, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • April 15, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • April 15, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 15, 2020: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 15, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
October, 2016
  • October 17, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 17, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • October 17, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • October 17, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • October 16, 2016: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • October 13, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • October 12, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 11, 2016: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 07, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 07, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
September, 2016
  • September 13, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 12, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2016
  • August 01, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 01, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
July, 2016
  • July 28, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 27, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 27, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 27, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
June, 2016
  • June 03, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
May, 2016
  • May 25, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 24, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2016
  • March 22, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 15, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 15, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2016
  • February 09, 2016: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • February 08, 2016: [Discovery]
January, 2016
  • January 29, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • January 29, 2016: [Response]
  • January 22, 2016: [Request]
  • January 22, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 19, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 19, 2016: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • January 19, 2016: [Order Returning Defendant to State Custody]
  • January 19, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 19, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 19, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 19, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • January 19, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • January 15, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 15, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 13, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 13, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 13, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 12, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • January 12, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.