U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cr-40009-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Tsegay
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2018
  • September 25, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • September 25, 2018: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • September 24, 2018: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
September, 2017
  • September 06, 2017: [Notice]
December, 2016
  • December 21, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
September, 2016
  • September 19, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • September 19, 2016: [Declaration]
  • September 19, 2016: [Waiver]
  • September 19, 2016: [Order to Exclude Period of Delay]
  • September 19, 2016: [Stipulation to Exclude Period of Delay]
  • September 19, 2016: [Statement of Facts in Support of Pretrial Diversion]
  • September 19, 2016: [Agreement for Pretrial Diversion]
July, 2016
  • July 13, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 12, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2016
  • May 11, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 10, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 02, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2016
  • April 20, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 18, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 06, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 05, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2016
  • March 16, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 09, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 08, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2016
  • January 25, 2016: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • January 22, 2016: [Discovery]
  • January 22, 2016: [Response]
  • January 21, 2016: [Response]
  • January 20, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • January 20, 2016: [Response]
  • January 19, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 19, 2016: [Request]
  • January 19, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 19, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 15, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 15, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 15, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 15, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • January 15, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 15, 2016: [Arrest]
  • January 15, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • January 15, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 12, 2016: [Indictment]
  • January 12, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.