U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cr-40004-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Zastrow
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
November, 2017
  • November 20, 2017: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • November 20, 2017: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
October, 2017
  • October 19, 2017: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 18, 2017: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 17, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 16, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • October 12, 2017: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • October 03, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 03, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 02, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 02, 2017: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • October 02, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 02, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 02, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • October 02, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 02, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 02, 2017: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
September, 2017
  • September 14, 2017: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • September 14, 2017: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
September, 2016
  • September 19, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 19, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • September 19, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • September 16, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • September 14, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • September 13, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • September 12, 2016: [Departure]
  • September 12, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 12, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 09, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
  • September 05, 2016: [Response to Motion]
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: [Letter]
  • August 30, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 30, 2016: [Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
  • August 29, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 17, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
July, 2016
  • July 05, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 05, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
June, 2016
  • June 28, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 27, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 27, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 27, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 24, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 24, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • June 24, 2016: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • June 24, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 22, 2016: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • June 09, 2016: [Report and Recommendations]
  • June 07, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • June 07, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 07, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 02, 2016: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • June 01, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Release from Custody]
  • May 31, 2016: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 25, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 24, 2016: [Order]
  • May 24, 2016: [Suppress]
  • May 12, 2016: [Consent]
  • May 10, 2016: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • May 10, 2016: [Discovery]
  • May 09, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 06, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 05, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • May 05, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 05, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2016
  • April 08, 2016: [Response]
  • April 06, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 06, 2016: [Request]
March, 2016
  • March 31, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 30, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • March 30, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 30, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 30, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • March 30, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 30, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 30, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • March 29, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 18, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 14, 2016: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • March 14, 2016: [Arrest - Other District]
January, 2016
  • January 12, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • January 12, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.