U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cr-40097-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Vanden Hoek
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 04, 2019: [Notice of Expiration of Probation]
October, 2016
  • October 19, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 03, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 03, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • October 03, 2016: [Sentencing]
September, 2016
  • September 22, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 22, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 08, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
August, 2016
  • August 29, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • August 08, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2016
  • July 11, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 11, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
June, 2016
  • June 27, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 27, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 27, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 27, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
May, 2016
  • May 24, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 18, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 17, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2016
  • April 20, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
March, 2016
  • March 17, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 09, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 08, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2016
  • February 09, 2016: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • February 08, 2016: [Discovery]
January, 2016
  • January 20, 2016: [Response]
  • January 19, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 19, 2016: [Request]
  • January 14, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 13, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 13, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 13, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 13, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 13, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 13, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • January 13, 2016: [Arrest]
  • January 13, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • January 13, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.