U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cr-40014-1
  • Case Name: USA v. He Crow
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • October 24, 2019: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
July, 2016
  • July 26, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • July 25, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 25, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • July 25, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • July 18, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 18, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 18, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 18, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 13, 2016: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
June, 2016
  • June 23, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 13, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
May, 2016
  • May 02, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2016
  • April 29, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 29, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 28, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • April 27, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 27, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 26, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 22, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 22, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 22, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
March, 2016
  • March 29, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 16, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 15, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2016
  • January 22, 2016: [Request]
  • January 22, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 21, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 21, 2016: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • January 21, 2016: [Order Returning Defendant to State Custody]
  • January 21, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 21, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 21, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 21, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • January 21, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • January 13, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 13, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 13, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.