U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cr-40001-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Zephier
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 10, 2020: [Notice of Expiration of Probation]
April, 2017
  • April 10, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 10, 2017: [Judgment - Amended]
  • April 10, 2017: [Restitution Hearing]
  • April 10, 2017: [Revocation of Probation - Final Hearing]
  • April 03, 2017: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
March, 2017
  • March 13, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • March 13, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 10, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • March 10, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 10, 2017: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • March 10, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 10, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 10, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • March 10, 2017: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
February, 2017
  • February 06, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 06, 2017: [Continue]
January, 2017
  • January 09, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • January 09, 2017: [Evidentiary Hearing]
September, 2016
  • September 12, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • September 08, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • September 08, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • September 08, 2016: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • September 07, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
August, 2016
  • August 08, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2016
  • July 25, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 22, 2016: [Information - Misdemeanor]
  • July 15, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 15, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 15, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 15, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
May, 2016
  • May 11, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 10, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 10, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2016
  • April 06, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 05, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2016
  • March 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 08, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2016
  • January 19, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 19, 2016: [Request]
  • January 19, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 19, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 15, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 15, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 15, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 15, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • January 15, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 15, 2016: [Arrest]
  • January 15, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • January 15, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 15, 2016: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.