U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:08-cr-30113-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Thin Elk
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 29, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
November, 2017
  • November 27, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 27, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
October, 2017
  • October 26, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 25, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 23, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 19, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • October 19, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
  • October 19, 2017: [Order]
  • October 19, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 19, 2017: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • October 19, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 19, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 19, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
January, 2017
  • January 06, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 05, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • January 05, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
December, 2016
  • December 28, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 20, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 19, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 19, 2016: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • December 16, 2016: [Report and Recommendations]
  • December 16, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • December 16, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 16, 2016: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 16, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 16, 2016: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • December 16, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 16, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
May, 2016
  • May 24, 2016: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 23, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
April, 2016
  • April 15, 2016: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • April 15, 2016: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • April 08, 2016: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 08, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 01, 2016: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
March, 2016
  • March 23, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 14, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 14, 2016: [Report and Recommendations]
  • March 14, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • March 14, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 14, 2016: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • March 14, 2016: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 14, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 14, 2016: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • March 14, 2016: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • March 14, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 14, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • March 14, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 11, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2016
  • January 21, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.