U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:04-cr-50064-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Feather Earring
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 21, 2019: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
October, 2018
  • October 02, 2018: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 02, 2018: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
March, 2018
  • March 06, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • March 05, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • March 05, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • February 12, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 12, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • February 12, 2018: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • February 12, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • February 12, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • February 12, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 12, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
July, 2016
  • July 19, 2016: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
June, 2016
  • June 22, 2016: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • June 20, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • June 20, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • June 07, 2016: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • June 01, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
May, 2016
  • May 25, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 24, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • May 24, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • May 24, 2016: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • May 24, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 24, 2016: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • May 24, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • May 24, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 24, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 24, 2016: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 23, 2016: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 23, 2016: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
February, 2016
  • February 04, 2016: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • February 04, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
January, 2016
  • January 28, 2016: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • January 22, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 22, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 21, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • January 21, 2016: [Waiver]
  • January 21, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 21, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 21, 2016: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 21, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 21, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • January 21, 2016: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • January 21, 2016: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • January 20, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 20, 2016: [Warrant Issued on Revocation]
  • January 20, 2016: [Order for Warrant - Probation Request]
  • January 20, 2016: [Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 20, 2016: [Request for Warrant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.