U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30001-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Little Shield
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 30, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • November 30, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 20, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 20, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
July, 2020
  • July 22, 2020: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • July 22, 2020: [Discovery]
  • July 21, 2020: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 16, 2020: [Invocation of Rights]
  • July 16, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 16, 2020: [Report and Recommendations]
  • July 16, 2020: [Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 16, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • July 16, 2020: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • July 16, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 16, 2020: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • July 16, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 15, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • July 08, 2020: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
June, 2020
  • June 17, 2020: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 17, 2020: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
December, 2019
  • December 10, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 25, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • November 25, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 06, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
October, 2019
  • October 22, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 17, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • October 17, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • October 02, 2019: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 01, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 01, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 01, 2019: [Text Order of Detention]
  • October 01, 2019: [Text Order Holding Defendant to Answer Revocation Petition]
September, 2019
  • September 18, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 18, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • September 18, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 18, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • September 18, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • September 17, 2019: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
August, 2016
  • August 04, 2016: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
June, 2016
  • June 20, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 20, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • June 20, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • June 17, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 17, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 02, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 02, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
May, 2016
  • May 17, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 17, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
April, 2016
  • April 04, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 04, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
March, 2016
  • March 31, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 29, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 29, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 29, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
February, 2016
  • February 16, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • February 12, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 10, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 09, 2016: [Request]
  • February 08, 2016: [Order]
  • February 05, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • February 05, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • February 05, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 05, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • February 05, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 05, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 05, 2016: [Arrest]
  • February 05, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • February 05, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • February 05, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 05, 2016: [Request]
  • February 05, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 05, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2016
  • January 21, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • January 21, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.