U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cr-10004-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Demery
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 18, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 17, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
July, 2020
  • July 22, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 22, 2020: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • July 22, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • July 09, 2020: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • June 16, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 15, 2020: [Report and Recommendations]
  • June 10, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • June 10, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 10, 2020: [Consent]
  • June 10, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 10, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 10, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 10, 2020: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • June 09, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 09, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
June, 2019
  • June 24, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • June 24, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • June 24, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 17, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
April, 2019
  • April 05, 2019: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • April 05, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • March 20, 2019: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
February, 2019
  • February 15, 2019: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • February 07, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • January 30, 2019: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • January 30, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • January 30, 2019: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • January 30, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 30, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 30, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • January 29, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • January 29, 2019: [Order of Detention]
January, 2018
  • January 05, 2018: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • January 04, 2018: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
October, 2016
  • October 25, 2016: [Judgment Returned Executed]
September, 2016
  • September 13, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 13, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • September 12, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • September 02, 2016: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • September 01, 2016: [Pre-Sentence Payment]
August, 2016
  • August 18, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 18, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 05, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • August 05, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 04, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • August 03, 2016: [Extend]
  • August 02, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
July, 2016
  • July 28, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • July 28, 2016: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • July 22, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2016
  • June 06, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 06, 2016: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • June 06, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 01, 2016: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
May, 2016
  • May 09, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 06, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 06, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 06, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
April, 2016
  • April 07, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
March, 2016
  • March 25, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 25, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2016
  • February 11, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • February 10, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • February 09, 2016: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • February 09, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 05, 2016: [Order]
  • February 05, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • February 05, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 05, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 04, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 04, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 04, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • February 04, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • February 04, 2016: [Request]
January, 2016
  • January 28, 2016: [Request]
  • January 28, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 26, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 22, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 21, 2016: [Indictment]
  • January 21, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.