U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cr-10001-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Martinez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Add and Terminate Judges]
January, 2017
  • January 06, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 06, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • January 05, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • January 05, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • January 04, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • January 04, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
December, 2016
  • December 12, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 12, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • December 12, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • December 12, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
November, 2016
  • November 17, 2016: [Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • November 16, 2016: [Pre-Sentence Payment]
  • November 14, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 14, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • November 10, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 04, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 04, 2016: [Response]
  • November 03, 2016: [Memorandum Letter]
October, 2016
  • October 28, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 28, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 13, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 13, 2016: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 13, 2016: [Downward Departure]
  • October 13, 2016: [Variance]
  • October 06, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2016
  • August 15, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 15, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 11, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2016
  • July 22, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 22, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 22, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 22, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 20, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Superseding - Redacted]
  • July 20, 2016: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • July 11, 2016: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
  • July 11, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 05, 2016: [Response]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • June 27, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 17, 2016: [Response to Motion]
  • June 16, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2016
  • May 25, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • May 06, 2016: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
April, 2016
  • April 29, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 29, 2016: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • April 19, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 15, 2016: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • April 15, 2016: [Transcript]
  • April 04, 2016: [Order Reassigning Case]
March, 2016
  • March 30, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 30, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 30, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • March 24, 2016: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
February, 2016
  • February 10, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • February 10, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • February 09, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • February 09, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • February 09, 2016: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • February 08, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 05, 2016: [Order]
  • February 05, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • February 05, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 05, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 04, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 04, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • February 04, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 04, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 04, 2016: [Request]
  • February 04, 2016: [Bail Report]
January, 2016
  • January 26, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 22, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 21, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • January 21, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.