U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cr-10002-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Crow Ghost
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2016
  • November 14, 2016: [Judgment Returned Executed]
September, 2016
  • September 21, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 21, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • September 20, 2016: [Sentencing]
August, 2016
  • August 19, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 19, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 19, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 19, 2016: [Status Conference]
  • August 17, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • August 17, 2016: [Sealed Evaluation]
  • August 10, 2016: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • August 10, 2016: [Information - Misdemeanor - Superseding]
  • August 09, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 09, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 09, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 08, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • August 08, 2016: [Extend]
July, 2016
  • July 07, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 07, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 07, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
June, 2016
  • June 23, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 23, 2016: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • June 16, 2016: [Terminate Hearings]
  • June 15, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 15, 2016: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • June 08, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 26, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 26, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2016
  • March 17, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 10, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • March 08, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 08, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
February, 2016
  • February 10, 2016: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • February 02, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
January, 2016
  • January 29, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 28, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 27, 2016: [Arrest]
  • January 26, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 26, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • January 26, 2016: [Request]
  • January 26, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 26, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 26, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • January 26, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 26, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • January 26, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 26, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • January 25, 2016: [Request]
  • January 21, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • January 21, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.