U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cr-10003-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gabe
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 30, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 30, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 09, 2021: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • August 09, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • July 23, 2021: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 25, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • June 24, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 24, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • June 24, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 23, 2021: [Report and Recommendations]
  • June 23, 2021: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 23, 2021: [Text Order of Detention]
  • June 23, 2021: [Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 23, 2021: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • June 23, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 23, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 23, 2021: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 23, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 21, 2021: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
  • June 21, 2021: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
October, 2016
  • October 11, 2016: [Judgment Returned Executed]
August, 2016
  • August 16, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 16, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • August 16, 2016: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • August 15, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • August 09, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 04, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 04, 2016: [Departure]
  • August 04, 2016: [Variance]
July, 2016
  • July 20, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 20, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 07, 2016: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • July 06, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
June, 2016
  • June 28, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • June 27, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 21, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
May, 2016
  • May 09, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 09, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 09, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 09, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 09, 2016: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • May 05, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Superseding - Redacted]
  • May 05, 2016: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
April, 2016
  • April 27, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 20, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 20, 2016: [Sealed Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 20, 2016: [Redacted Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 20, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 07, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
March, 2016
  • March 31, 2016: [Furlough]
  • March 25, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 25, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
February, 2016
  • February 10, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • February 09, 2016: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • February 09, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • February 09, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 05, 2016: [Order]
  • February 05, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • February 05, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 05, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 04, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 04, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • February 04, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 04, 2016: [Request]
  • February 04, 2016: [Bail Report]
January, 2016
  • January 28, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • January 28, 2016: [Request]
  • January 28, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 26, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 22, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 21, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • January 21, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.