U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30008-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gorisek et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
April, 2021
  • April 20, 2021: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • April 19, 2021: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
October, 2020
  • October 16, 2020: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 15, 2020: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
November, 2019
  • November 01, 2019: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • November 01, 2019: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
September, 2019
  • September 16, 2019: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
September, 2018
  • September 19, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
June, 2018
  • June 12, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • June 12, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
May, 2018
  • May 01, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
April, 2018
  • April 26, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • April 26, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • April 26, 2018: [Order]
  • April 26, 2018: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • April 26, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 26, 2018: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 25, 2018: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 11, 2018: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 04, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • April 04, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 04, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • April 04, 2018: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • April 04, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 03, 2018: [Invocation of Rights]
  • April 03, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 03, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
October, 2017
  • October 23, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • June 27, 2017: [Forfeiture]
May, 2017
  • May 22, 2017: [Declaration of Publication]
March, 2017
  • March 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • March 24, 2017: [Forfeiture]
  • March 24, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
September, 2016
  • September 26, 2016: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
August, 2016
  • August 29, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 29, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • August 29, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • August 16, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 16, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 10, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • August 09, 2016: [Variance]
  • August 04, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 04, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • August 04, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • August 02, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 01, 2016: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • August 01, 2016: [Sealed Sentencing Memorandum]
July, 2016
  • July 27, 2016: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • July 21, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • July 19, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 15, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 13, 2016: [Continue]
  • July 11, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • July 06, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • July 06, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 06, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • July 05, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 05, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
June, 2016
  • June 23, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 23, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 21, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 10, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • June 08, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 01, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 01, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
May, 2016
  • May 25, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • May 23, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 20, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 20, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 20, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
April, 2016
  • April 19, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 19, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 15, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 15, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 15, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 15, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 12, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 12, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 11, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 08, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 08, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 08, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
March, 2016
  • March 04, 2016: [Order of Detention]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 26, 2016: [Consent]
  • February 26, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 25, 2016: [Consent]
  • February 25, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 19, 2016: [Disclosure ]
  • February 19, 2016: [Request]
  • February 16, 2016: [Request]
  • February 12, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 04, 2016: [Order]
  • February 03, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Amended]
  • February 03, 2016: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • February 03, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • February 03, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • February 03, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • February 03, 2016: [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
  • February 03, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 03, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 03, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • February 03, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 03, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • February 03, 2016: [Request]
  • February 03, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 03, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • February 02, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • February 02, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 02, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 02, 2016: [Order]
  • February 02, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
January, 2016
  • January 29, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • January 29, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • January 28, 2016: [Waiver]
  • January 26, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • January 26, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • January 26, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • January 26, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 26, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 26, 2016: [Request]
  • January 26, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • January 26, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • January 26, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 26, 2016: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • January 26, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • January 25, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 25, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 22, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 21, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 21, 2016: [Indictment]
  • January 21, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.