U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30005-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brave
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 08, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • July 08, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • July 05, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • July 05, 2019: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
May, 2019
  • May 10, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 08, 2019: [Continue]
April, 2019
  • April 15, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • April 02, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 02, 2019: [Continue]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 27, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 14, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • March 01, 2019: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
January, 2019
  • January 23, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 23, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • January 23, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
October, 2018
  • October 01, 2018: [Order]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • September 27, 2018: [Furlough]
August, 2018
  • August 14, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • August 14, 2018: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • August 14, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • August 14, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 13, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
  • August 13, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • August 13, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 13, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
December, 2016
  • December 07, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • December 07, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 06, 2016: [Sentencing]
November, 2016
  • November 28, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 28, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 10, 2016: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 10, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
October, 2016
  • October 26, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • October 20, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
September, 2016
  • September 26, 2016: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • September 23, 2016: [Furlough]
  • September 23, 2016: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • September 19, 2016: [Response]
  • September 16, 2016: [Furlough]
  • September 14, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 14, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 12, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 12, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 12, 2016: [Sealed Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 12, 2016: [Redacted Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 12, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 12, 2016: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • September 08, 2016: [Extend]
  • September 08, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • September 07, 2016: [Extend]
August, 2016
  • August 05, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 02, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 02, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
June, 2016
  • June 02, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 02, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 02, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
March, 2016
  • March 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 25, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 25, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2016
  • February 02, 2016: [Order]
  • February 02, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 01, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 01, 2016: [Stipulation]
January, 2016
  • January 29, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • January 28, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 28, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • January 28, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 28, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 28, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • January 28, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 28, 2016: [Arrest]
  • January 28, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • January 28, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 28, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • January 28, 2016: [Request]
  • January 28, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 27, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 27, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 21, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • January 21, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.