U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30007-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Buffalo et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 14, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • November 14, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 14, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • November 09, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • November 07, 2022: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 04, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • November 02, 2022: [Text Order]
  • November 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 26, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 25, 2022: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
November, 2021
  • November 02, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 01, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • October 18, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • October 06, 2021: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
September, 2021
  • September 02, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 02, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 01, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 01, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • September 01, 2021: [Report and Recommendations]
  • September 01, 2021: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • September 01, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • September 01, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2020
  • July 07, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • July 06, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • July 01, 2020: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • July 01, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
June, 2020
  • June 18, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 18, 2020: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • June 05, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 02, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
May, 2020
  • May 27, 2020: [Report and Recommendations]
  • May 27, 2020: [Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 27, 2020: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 27, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • May 27, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 27, 2020: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • May 27, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2020
  • April 15, 2020: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • April 15, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 15, 2020: [Text Order on Oral Motion for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing]
  • April 15, 2020: [Oral Motion for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 15, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • April 15, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 10, 2020: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • April 07, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 07, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • April 07, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 02, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
March, 2020
  • March 12, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • March 11, 2020: [Report and Recommendations]
  • March 11, 2020: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 11, 2020: [Text Order of Detention]
  • March 11, 2020: [Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 11, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • March 11, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 11, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 11, 2020: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • March 11, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 11, 2020: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 09, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 06, 2020: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 25, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • November 18, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 12, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 23, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • October 23, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • October 10, 2019: [Text Order of Detention]
  • October 10, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 10, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 03, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 27, 2019: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 26, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • September 26, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 26, 2019: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • September 26, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • September 26, 2019: [Order of Detention]
July, 2019
  • July 19, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
April, 2019
  • April 16, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 15, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • April 09, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • March 28, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 26, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • March 26, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 26, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 26, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 26, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • March 26, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • March 26, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 26, 2019: [Text Order Holding Defendant to Answer Revocation Petition]
  • March 26, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
January, 2019
  • January 04, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 04, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
December, 2018
  • December 27, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 12, 2018: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • December 12, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • December 12, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 12, 2018: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 11, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • December 11, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • December 11, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 11, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 11, 2018: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • December 11, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
August, 2018
  • August 20, 2018: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 17, 2018: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
December, 2016
  • December 15, 2016: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
August, 2016
  • August 29, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 29, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • August 29, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • August 12, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 12, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
July, 2016
  • July 20, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • July 19, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2016
  • June 21, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 21, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • June 21, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • June 15, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 15, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 08, 2016: [Sealed Supporting Document(s)]
  • June 08, 2016: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • June 07, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 06, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
May, 2016
  • May 26, 2016: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 20, 2016: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 19, 2016: [Sealed Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • May 19, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 18, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • May 17, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 17, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 17, 2016: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
April, 2016
  • April 27, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • April 26, 2016: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • April 25, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 25, 2016: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
  • April 20, 2016: [Terminate Hearings]
  • April 19, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 18, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
March, 2016
  • March 30, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 29, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 28, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 25, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 25, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 25, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
February, 2016
  • February 26, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 19, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 12, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 12, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 11, 2016: [Release from Custody]
  • February 04, 2016: [Consent]
  • February 04, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 04, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 03, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 03, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • February 02, 2016: [Order]
January, 2016
  • January 29, 2016: [Order]
  • January 29, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 29, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • January 29, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • January 29, 2016: [Request]
  • January 27, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 27, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 27, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • January 26, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • January 26, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 26, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • January 26, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 26, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • January 26, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 26, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 26, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • January 26, 2016: [Request]
  • January 26, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 26, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • January 26, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 26, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • January 26, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 26, 2016: [Arrest]
  • January 25, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 25, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 25, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • January 21, 2016: [Indictment]
  • January 21, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.