U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30004-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Whipple
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2016
  • June 20, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 20, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • June 20, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 20, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • June 07, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 07, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
May, 2016
  • May 24, 2016: [Notice]
  • May 24, 2016: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 06, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2016
  • March 28, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 28, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 24, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • March 24, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 22, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 21, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 21, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 21, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
February, 2016
  • February 12, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 09, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • February 09, 2016: [Order]
  • February 08, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • February 05, 2016: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • February 04, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Amended]
  • February 04, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • February 04, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 04, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 04, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 04, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • February 04, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 04, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 04, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • February 04, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 04, 2016: [Request]
  • February 04, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • February 04, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 04, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2016
  • January 28, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 27, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 22, 2016: [Add Counts - Indictment]
  • January 21, 2016: [Indictment]
  • January 21, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.