U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30003-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Red Bird
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Order on Request for Earned Pro-Social Time Off of Supervision]
  • November 22, 2019: [Request for Earned Pro-Social Time Off of Supervision]
October, 2018
  • October 15, 2018: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 12, 2018: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
June, 2016
  • June 15, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 13, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 13, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • June 13, 2016: [Sentencing]
May, 2016
  • May 17, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 17, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 05, 2016: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • May 04, 2016: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 04, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 02, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
April, 2016
  • April 21, 2016: [Continue]
  • April 16, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2016
  • March 09, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 09, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 07, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 04, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 04, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 04, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
February, 2016
  • February 02, 2016: [Order]
  • February 02, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 01, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
January, 2016
  • January 28, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 28, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • January 28, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 28, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 28, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 28, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • January 28, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • January 28, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 28, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • January 28, 2016: [Request]
  • January 28, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 28, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • January 27, 2016: [Request]
  • January 27, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 27, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 21, 2016: [Indictment]
  • January 21, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.