U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30002-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hill
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 17, 2020: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
May, 2019
  • May 14, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • May 13, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • May 13, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 29, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • April 29, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • April 29, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 29, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 28, 2019: [Text Order of Detention]
  • April 28, 2019: [Text Order Holding Defendant to Answer Revocation Petition]
  • April 26, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • April 26, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 26, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • April 26, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 26, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • April 25, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
November, 2018
  • November 14, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 14, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • November 07, 2018: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • November 07, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
October, 2018
  • October 24, 2018: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
September, 2018
  • September 26, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 19, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • September 19, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • September 19, 2018: [Order]
  • September 19, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 14, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 14, 2018: [Invocation of Rights]
  • September 14, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 14, 2018: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • September 14, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • September 14, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 04, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • September 04, 2018: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • September 02, 2018: [Order]
July, 2016
  • July 25, 2016: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • July 12, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 05, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 05, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • July 05, 2016: [Sentencing]
June, 2016
  • June 29, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • June 23, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 23, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 07, 2016: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
May, 2016
  • May 25, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 25, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • May 10, 2016: [Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • May 03, 2016: [Victim Impact Statement(s)]
April, 2016
  • April 11, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 11, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 05, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 04, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 04, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 04, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
March, 2016
  • March 21, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 15, 2016: [Consent]
  • March 15, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2016
  • January 29, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 27, 2016: [Request]
  • January 26, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • January 26, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 25, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • January 25, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • January 25, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 25, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 25, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • January 25, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • January 25, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 25, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 21, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • January 21, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.