U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30006-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Medearis
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 06, 2022: [Transcript - Public]
  • May 06, 2022: [Transcript - Restricted]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 11, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 11, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • April 01, 2022: [Transcript]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Final Presentence Report]
  • March 14, 2022: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Draft Presentence Report]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 20, 2022: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
December, 2021
  • December 13, 2021: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
July, 2021
  • July 20, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
December, 2020
  • December 29, 2020: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Release Defendant Pending Trial]
  • December 29, 2020: [Oral Motion to Release Defendant Pending Trial (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 29, 2020: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 29, 2020: [Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 29, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 23, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • December 22, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 22, 2020: [Text Order on Oral Motion for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing]
  • December 22, 2020: [Oral Motion for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 22, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • December 22, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 22, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 22, 2020: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
July, 2020
  • July 22, 2020: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
February, 2019
  • February 06, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • February 05, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • February 05, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 04, 2019: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • January 28, 2019: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • January 28, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • January 24, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • January 16, 2019: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • January 04, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 04, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 03, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • January 03, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • January 03, 2019: [Order]
  • January 03, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 03, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • January 03, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 03, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 03, 2019: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • January 02, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
October, 2018
  • October 06, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
  • October 04, 2018: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
April, 2017
  • April 10, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 10, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • April 10, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • April 03, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 03, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
March, 2017
  • March 29, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • March 24, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 21, 2017: [Extend]
  • March 17, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 08, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
  • March 07, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
January, 2017
  • January 25, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 24, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 24, 2017: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • January 23, 2017: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • January 17, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 17, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • January 17, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 17, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 17, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 11, 2017: [Extend]
December, 2016
  • December 09, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 09, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 09, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
October, 2016
  • October 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 13, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 13, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
September, 2016
  • September 09, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 07, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 07, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 28, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 28, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
May, 2016
  • May 20, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 19, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 19, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2016
  • March 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 25, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 25, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 08, 2016: [Arraignment]
February, 2016
  • February 02, 2016: [Order]
  • February 01, 2016: [Stipulation]
January, 2016
  • January 29, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 28, 2016: [Request]
  • January 26, 2016: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • January 26, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • January 26, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 26, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 26, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 26, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 26, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • January 26, 2016: [Request]
  • January 26, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 26, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 25, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 25, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 25, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • January 21, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 21, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 21, 2016: [Indictment]
  • January 21, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.