U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30011-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Russell
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2017
  • August 08, 2017: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • August 08, 2017: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
September, 2016
  • September 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • September 27, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • September 27, 2016: [Forfeiture]
  • September 07, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
August, 2016
  • August 29, 2016: [Declaration of Publication]
  • August 22, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • August 01, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 01, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • August 01, 2016: [Sentencing]
July, 2016
  • July 20, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • July 19, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 19, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 18, 2016: [Redacted Document]
  • July 18, 2016: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 08, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • July 01, 2016: [Notice]
June, 2016
  • June 30, 2016: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 22, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • June 08, 2016: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • June 07, 2016: [Forfeiture]
  • June 07, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
May, 2016
  • May 10, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 09, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 03, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 02, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 02, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 02, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
March, 2016
  • March 16, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • March 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 11, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 11, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2016
  • February 12, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 10, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 10, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2016
  • January 29, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 29, 2016: [Order]
  • January 27, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • January 27, 2016: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • January 26, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • January 26, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • January 26, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 26, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 26, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 26, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • January 26, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 26, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • January 26, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 26, 2016: [Request]
  • January 26, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 25, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 25, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 22, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 22, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 22, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • January 22, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.