U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30013-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Flute
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2016
  • June 14, 2016: [Receipt for Payment]
  • June 13, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 13, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • June 13, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • June 13, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 09, 2016: [Departure]
  • June 09, 2016: [Variance]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • May 31, 2016: [Extend]
  • May 31, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 31, 2016: [Sealed Supporting Document(s)]
  • May 31, 2016: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • May 17, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 17, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 11, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 05, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 04, 2016: [Letter]
  • May 02, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
April, 2016
  • April 29, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 27, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 21, 2016: [Continue]
  • April 20, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2016
  • March 09, 2016: [Pre-Sentence Payment]
  • March 08, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 08, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 02, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 01, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 01, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 01, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
February, 2016
  • February 12, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 03, 2016: [Order]
  • February 02, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • February 02, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 02, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • February 02, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 02, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 02, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 02, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • February 02, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 02, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • February 02, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 02, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 02, 2016: [Arrest]
  • February 02, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • February 02, 2016: [Request]
  • February 01, 2016: [Request]
  • February 01, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 01, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 01, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2016
  • January 22, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • January 22, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.