U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30009-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bowker
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2017
  • September 26, 2017: [Judgment Returned Executed]
August, 2017
  • August 10, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 10, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 08, 2017: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • August 08, 2017: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • July 27, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 18, 2017: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • July 12, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 06, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 06, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
February, 2017
  • February 17, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • February 17, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • February 17, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • February 16, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 10, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • February 10, 2017: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
January, 2017
  • January 04, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
December, 2016
  • December 06, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 06, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • December 05, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 05, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • December 05, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
November, 2016
  • November 28, 2016: [Departure]
  • November 23, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • November 18, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 18, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 08, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • November 07, 2016: [Extend]
  • November 07, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
October, 2016
  • October 20, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
September, 2016
  • September 12, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 09, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 29, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 29, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 29, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
July, 2016
  • July 27, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 25, 2016: [Consent]
  • July 25, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2016
  • June 20, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 20, 2016: [Consent]
  • June 15, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2016
  • May 10, 2016: [Order]
  • May 09, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • May 06, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 05, 2016: [Request]
  • May 05, 2016: [Consent]
  • May 02, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2016
  • April 04, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 04, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 04, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 04, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2016
  • March 30, 2016: [Extend]
February, 2016
  • February 17, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • February 12, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 08, 2016: [Order]
  • February 05, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • February 05, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 05, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 05, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 05, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • February 05, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 05, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • February 05, 2016: [Arrest]
  • February 05, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 05, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • February 05, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 05, 2016: [Request]
  • February 05, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 05, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 05, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2016
  • January 22, 2016: [Indictment]
  • January 22, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.