U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cr-30010-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Eagle Hunter
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2017
  • March 17, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Public Transcript for Redaction Purposes]
  • March 17, 2017: [Transcript - Public]
  • March 17, 2017: [Transcript - Restricted]
April, 2016
  • April 22, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 22, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • April 18, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • April 01, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 01, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
March, 2016
  • March 29, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 16, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
February, 2016
  • February 08, 2016: [Order]
  • February 05, 2016: [Order]
  • February 05, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • February 02, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 02, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 02, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • February 02, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 02, 2016: [Arrest]
  • February 02, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 02, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • February 01, 2016: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • February 01, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2016
  • January 29, 2016: [Information - Felony]
  • January 29, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 28, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 28, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 28, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 27, 2016: [Request]
  • January 22, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • January 22, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.