U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:10-cr-30015-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Medearis
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2017
  • April 11, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 10, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 10, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • April 03, 2017: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • April 03, 2017: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
March, 2017
  • March 29, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • March 24, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 21, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • March 21, 2017: [Extend]
  • March 17, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 07, 2017: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
January, 2017
  • January 25, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 24, 2017: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
January, 2016
  • January 26, 2016: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • January 26, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • January 26, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 26, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 26, 2016: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 26, 2016: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • January 26, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 26, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 26, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • January 26, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 25, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 25, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.