U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cr-40003-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Zimmer
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 28, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2020
  • July 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
  • July 02, 2020: [Letter]
June, 2020
  • June 22, 2020: [Supplement]
  • June 15, 2020: [Response]
  • June 15, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • June 09, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • June 09, 2020: [Extend]
May, 2020
  • May 15, 2020: [Supplement]
  • May 14, 2020: [Notice of Intent Not to Supplement]
April, 2020
  • April 27, 2020: [Supplement]
  • April 24, 2020: [Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
January, 2020
  • January 29, 2020: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence]
December, 2019
  • December 18, 2019: [Reduce Sentence]
July, 2019
  • July 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2019
  • June 17, 2019: [Response]
May, 2019
  • May 28, 2019: [Notice]
  • May 09, 2019: [Notice]
  • May 09, 2019: [Mail Returned]
  • May 09, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 07, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • May 02, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • May 01, 2019: [Extend]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2018
  • December 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • December 07, 2018: [Reconsideration]
July, 2016
  • July 19, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
June, 2016
  • June 27, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 27, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • June 27, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • June 23, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • June 20, 2016: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • June 16, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 16, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
May, 2016
  • May 27, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 20, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
April, 2016
  • April 04, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 04, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
March, 2016
  • March 28, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 28, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 28, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 28, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
February, 2016
  • February 09, 2016: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • February 08, 2016: [Discovery]
  • February 03, 2016: [Response]
  • February 01, 2016: [Request]
  • February 01, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
January, 2016
  • January 27, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 26, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • January 26, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 26, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 26, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 26, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • January 26, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 26, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 26, 2016: [Arrest]
  • January 26, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • January 26, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 26, 2016: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.