U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:98-cr-30128-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Goodshield
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2016
  • September 07, 2016: [Judgment Returned Executed]
June, 2016
  • June 06, 2016: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • June 06, 2016: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
May, 2016
  • May 27, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 27, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 20, 2016: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • May 19, 2016: [Extend]
  • May 19, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 10, 2016: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
March, 2016
  • March 30, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 29, 2016: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • March 16, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • March 10, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 09, 2016: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • March 08, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • March 08, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 08, 2016: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 08, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 08, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 08, 2016: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • March 08, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • March 08, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 08, 2016: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 08, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2016
  • January 26, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.