U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50002-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Haag
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
August, 2019
  • August 09, 2019: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
July, 2019
  • July 09, 2019: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
October, 2018
  • October 22, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
September, 2018
  • September 20, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
August, 2018
  • August 22, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
July, 2018
  • July 24, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
June, 2018
  • June 21, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
May, 2018
  • May 25, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
April, 2018
  • April 11, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
January, 2018
  • January 04, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
December, 2017
  • December 04, 2017: [Receipt for Payment]
October, 2017
  • October 23, 2017: [Receipt for Payment]
June, 2016
  • June 22, 2016: [Judgment Returned Executed]
  • June 06, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Judgment - Amended]
  • May 27, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • May 27, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 27, 2016: [Receipt for Payment]
  • May 27, 2016: [Exhibit List]
  • May 27, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • May 26, 2016: [Objection]
  • May 23, 2016: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • May 20, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 20, 2016: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • May 20, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 20, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 20, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
April, 2016
  • April 15, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 01, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
February, 2016
  • February 19, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 19, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • February 12, 2016: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • February 12, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 12, 2016: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • February 12, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 12, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 12, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • February 12, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 03, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
January, 2016
  • January 27, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 27, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • January 27, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 27, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • January 26, 2016: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • January 26, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 26, 2016: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 26, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 26, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 26, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 26, 2016: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.