U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cr-40002-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Reta-Castillo
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2016
  • April 12, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 12, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • April 11, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 11, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • April 08, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 08, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 05, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 04, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2016
  • March 09, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 09, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 09, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 09, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 08, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
February, 2016
  • February 18, 2016: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • February 18, 2016: [Discovery]
  • February 17, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 17, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 01, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 01, 2016: [Request]
January, 2016
  • January 28, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 27, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 27, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • January 27, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 27, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 27, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 27, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • January 27, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • January 26, 2016: [Case Unsealed]
  • January 26, 2016: [Arrest]
  • January 26, 2016: [Interpreter Needed]
  • January 26, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.