U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50013-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Fuentes-Arias
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2016
  • July 14, 2016: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
March, 2016
  • March 03, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • March 03, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 03, 2016: [Sentencing]
February, 2016
  • February 25, 2016: [Variance]
  • February 25, 2016: [Departure]
  • February 23, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 23, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • February 22, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • February 16, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • February 01, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
January, 2016
  • January 29, 2016: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 27, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 27, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 27, 2016: [Waiver]
  • January 27, 2016: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • January 27, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 27, 2016: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
  • January 26, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • January 26, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.