U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50010-1
  • Case Name: USA v. LeBeau et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 09, 2020: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Order on Exhibits]
June, 2020
  • June 17, 2020: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
May, 2020
  • May 08, 2020: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
  • May 08, 2020: [Order for Return of Exhibit(s)]
July, 2019
  • July 03, 2019: [Appeal Record Returned]
June, 2019
  • June 21, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
May, 2019
  • May 29, 2019: [USCA Judgment]
November, 2018
  • November 21, 2018: [Transcript - Redacted]
  • November 14, 2018: [Appeal Record Returned]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [USCA Mandate]
  • October 10, 2018: [USCA Judgment]
  • October 02, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
September, 2018
  • September 10, 2018: [Transcript Redaction Request]
  • September 05, 2018: [Supplemental Appeal Record sent to USCA]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: [Transcript - Public]
  • August 30, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Public Transcript for Redaction Purposes]
  • August 30, 2018: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • August 24, 2018: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • August 21, 2018: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • August 20, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Public Transcript for Redaction Purposes]
  • August 20, 2018: [Transcript - Public]
  • August 20, 2018: [Transcript - Restricted]
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: [USCA Order]
  • July 30, 2018: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • July 26, 2018: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • July 26, 2018: [Court Reporter Information]
  • July 25, 2018: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • July 18, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 18, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • July 16, 2018: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • July 13, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • July 13, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • July 13, 2018: [Supplemental Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • July 12, 2018: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • July 12, 2018: [USCA Order]
  • July 12, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Public Transcript for Redaction Purposes]
  • July 12, 2018: [Transcript - Public]
  • July 12, 2018: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • July 09, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • July 06, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • July 03, 2018: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • July 03, 2018: [Letter]
  • July 02, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Public Transcript for Redaction Purposes]
  • July 02, 2018: [Transcript - Public]
  • July 02, 2018: [Transcript - Restricted]
June, 2018
  • June 06, 2018: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • June 05, 2018: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • June 05, 2018: [Court Reporter Information]
  • June 04, 2018: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • June 04, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 04, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
May, 2018
  • May 30, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 21, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • May 21, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • May 18, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • May 14, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 14, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 14, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 14, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 01, 2018: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
April, 2018
  • April 20, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • April 06, 2018: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
March, 2018
  • March 23, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • March 01, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • February 28, 2018: [Continue]
  • February 28, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 27, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • February 27, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 27, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • February 15, 2018: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • February 15, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • February 09, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • January 17, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 10, 2018: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 10, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • January 10, 2018: [Consent]
  • January 10, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 04, 2018: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
December, 2017
  • December 21, 2017: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • December 21, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • December 21, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • December 21, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 24, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 20, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • November 15, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 14, 2017: [Order on Motion to Sever Defendant]
  • November 07, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • November 06, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • November 06, 2017: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • November 06, 2017: [Amended Plea Agreement]
  • November 06, 2017: [Consent]
  • November 06, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 06, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Amended]
  • November 06, 2017: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • October 31, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • October 31, 2017: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • October 30, 2017: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • October 27, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 27, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 27, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 25, 2017: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 25, 2017: [Notice]
  • October 20, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • October 19, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • October 19, 2017: [Notice]
  • October 19, 2017: [Extend]
  • October 17, 2017: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 17, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 17, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 17, 2017: [Sever Defendant]
  • October 16, 2017: [Notice]
  • October 13, 2017: [Notice]
August, 2017
  • August 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 04, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • August 03, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2017
  • July 21, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 21, 2017: [Order]
  • July 13, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Public Transcript for Redaction Purposes]
  • July 13, 2017: [Transcript - Public]
  • July 13, 2017: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • July 12, 2017: [Notice]
June, 2017
  • June 15, 2017: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • June 15, 2017: [Transcript]
  • June 14, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • June 01, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 01, 2017: [Order on Motion for Disclosure]
May, 2017
  • May 16, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 08, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 08, 2017: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • May 05, 2017: [Disclosure ]
  • May 02, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 24, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2017
  • March 27, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 17, 2017: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • March 17, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 17, 2017: [Consent]
  • March 17, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 17, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • March 17, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 17, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 15, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 10, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 10, 2017: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • March 10, 2017: [Amended Plea Agreement]
  • March 10, 2017: [Consent]
  • March 10, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 07, 2017: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • March 07, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
  • March 07, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Amended]
  • March 03, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
  • March 03, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 03, 2017: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • February 22, 2017: [Terminate Hearings]
  • February 21, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 21, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 21, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 17, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • February 17, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 17, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 17, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
November, 2016
  • November 17, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 17, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 16, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • November 10, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2016
  • August 25, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • August 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 19, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • August 19, 2016: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • August 19, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2016
  • July 29, 2016: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • July 27, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Superseding - Redacted]
  • July 27, 2016: [Indictment - Superseding]
June, 2016
  • June 10, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • June 09, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 07, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • June 02, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2016
  • March 18, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 18, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • March 15, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • March 15, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 14, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 14, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • March 03, 2016: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
February, 2016
  • February 26, 2016: [Text Order]
  • February 24, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • February 24, 2016: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • February 12, 2016: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • February 12, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 02, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
January, 2016
  • January 29, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • January 29, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 29, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • January 29, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 29, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • January 29, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 29, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 28, 2016: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • January 28, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • January 28, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 28, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 27, 2016: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 27, 2016: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 27, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • January 27, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.