U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50009-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Colhoff et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 25, 2019: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
June, 2018
  • June 04, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
February, 2018
  • February 01, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
January, 2018
  • January 18, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
  • January 17, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
October, 2017
  • October 13, 2017: [Mail Returned]
  • October 03, 2017: [Receipt for Payment]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Receipt for Payment]
  • June 16, 2017: [Receipt for Payment]
  • June 02, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
May, 2017
  • May 16, 2017: [Receipt for Payment]
March, 2017
  • March 15, 2017: [Receipt for Payment]
January, 2017
  • January 17, 2017: [Receipt for Payment]
December, 2016
  • December 15, 2016: [Receipt for Payment]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 30, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • November 30, 2016: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • November 30, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • November 30, 2016: [Receipt for Payment]
  • November 23, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 23, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 18, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 15, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
October, 2016
  • October 21, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • October 20, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 20, 2016: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • October 19, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 19, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • October 19, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 19, 2016: [Receipt for Payment]
  • October 19, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • October 18, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 18, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 14, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 14, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 13, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 11, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 11, 2016: [Release from Custody]
  • October 07, 2016: [Order on Ex Parte Motion for Revocation]
  • October 07, 2016: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • October 06, 2016: [Arrest]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 27, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2016
  • August 23, 2016: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • August 23, 2016: [Order]
  • August 22, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 22, 2016: [Order]
  • August 19, 2016: [Sealed Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 19, 2016: [Consent]
  • August 19, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 19, 2016: [Redacted Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 17, 2016: [Information - Misdemeanor - Superseding]
  • August 10, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 10, 2016: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 10, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 10, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 10, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
July, 2016
  • July 14, 2016: [Consent]
  • July 13, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 01, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2016
  • May 27, 2016: [Consent]
  • May 20, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 19, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 18, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 11, 2016: [Consent]
April, 2016
  • April 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 22, 2016: [Continue]
  • April 22, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2016
  • March 29, 2016: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • March 14, 2016: [Request]
  • March 14, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • March 11, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 11, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 11, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 11, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • March 11, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 11, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 11, 2016: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • March 11, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • March 10, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 10, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 10, 2016: [Arrest]
February, 2016
  • February 22, 2016: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • February 09, 2016: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 09, 2016: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • February 09, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 08, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 08, 2016: [Request]
  • February 08, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 08, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • February 08, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 08, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 08, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 08, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • February 08, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 08, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • February 08, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 08, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • February 05, 2016: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • February 03, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 03, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
January, 2016
  • January 29, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 27, 2016: [Summons Issued]
  • January 27, 2016: [Order]
  • January 27, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • January 27, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.