U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50012-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Reddy
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2017
  • June 02, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 02, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • June 02, 2017: [Sentencing]
May, 2017
  • May 22, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 22, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 22, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
April, 2017
  • April 25, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 11, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 06, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2017
  • March 09, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • February 24, 2017: [Consent]
  • February 24, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 02, 2017: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • February 02, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 02, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 02, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
January, 2017
  • January 18, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 10, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 21, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 13, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2016
  • November 09, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 09, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 01, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2016
  • September 27, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 23, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 20, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2016
  • August 02, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
July, 2016
  • July 26, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 26, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2016
  • June 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 27, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 20, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 17, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2016
  • April 12, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 07, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 05, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2016
  • March 31, 2016: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • March 25, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • March 25, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • March 25, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 24, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 23, 2016: [Request]
  • March 23, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 23, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 23, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • March 23, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 23, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 23, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 23, 2016: [Arrest]
  • March 22, 2016: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • March 22, 2016: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 21, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 21, 2016: [Bail Report]
January, 2016
  • January 27, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • January 27, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.