U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50008-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ruff
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2017
  • November 21, 2017: [Order on Request for Early Termination]
  • November 21, 2017: [Request for Early Termination]
July, 2016
  • July 27, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 27, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • July 27, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • July 20, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 20, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 19, 2016: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • July 07, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
June, 2016
  • June 29, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 20, 2016: [Order]
  • May 20, 2016: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • May 20, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 12, 2016: [Information - Misdemeanor - Superseding]
  • May 11, 2016: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • May 11, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 11, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 11, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 03, 2016: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
April, 2016
  • April 18, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 08, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2016
  • March 04, 2016: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
February, 2016
  • February 24, 2016: [Request]
  • February 24, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 24, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • February 24, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 24, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 24, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 24, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 24, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 24, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • February 24, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 24, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 23, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • February 23, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 23, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 23, 2016: [Arrest]
January, 2016
  • January 27, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • January 27, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.