U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cr-40017-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Recinos De La Rosa
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • July 21, 2022: [Combined Plea and Sentencing Hearing]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 15, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 13, 2022: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • May 17, 2022: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 17, 2022: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • May 17, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 17, 2022: [Consent]
  • May 17, 2022: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • May 17, 2022: [Response]
  • May 17, 2022: [Request]
  • May 17, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 17, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 17, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • May 17, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 17, 2022: [Text Order of Detention]
  • May 17, 2022: [Bail Report]
  • May 16, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 16, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2016
  • January 27, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • January 27, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.