U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cr-40016-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Aguiegos-Hernandez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2016
  • April 18, 2016: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • April 18, 2016: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 18, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 18, 2016: [Sentencing]
  • April 14, 2016: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 14, 2016: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 11, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 08, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • April 08, 2016: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • April 08, 2016: [Discovery]
March, 2016
  • March 22, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 22, 2016: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
February, 2016
  • February 11, 2016: [Response]
  • February 10, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 10, 2016: [Request]
  • February 10, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 09, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 09, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 09, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • February 09, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 09, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 09, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • February 09, 2016: [Arrest]
  • February 09, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • February 09, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2016
  • January 27, 2016: [Interpreter Needed]
  • January 27, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • January 27, 2016: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.