U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50007-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cordova et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • February 24, 2022: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
May, 2021
  • May 06, 2021: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • May 06, 2021: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
December, 2020
  • December 08, 2020: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 07, 2020: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
April, 2020
  • April 23, 2020: [Mail Returned]
February, 2020
  • February 25, 2020: [Mail Returned]
  • February 12, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 12, 2020: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
  • February 12, 2020: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence]
November, 2019
  • November 19, 2019: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 12, 2019: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
September, 2018
  • September 10, 2018: [Reduce Sentence]
August, 2018
  • August 27, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • August 22, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • August 15, 2018: [Extend]
July, 2018
  • July 05, 2018: [Reduce Sentence]
  • July 02, 2018: [Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
May, 2018
  • May 18, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 18, 2018: [Judgment Returned Executed]
March, 2018
  • March 09, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • March 09, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 02, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
  • March 01, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • March 01, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
February, 2018
  • February 20, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • February 15, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • February 15, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • February 13, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • February 08, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • February 08, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 08, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
November, 2017
  • November 21, 2017: [Continue]
June, 2017
  • June 15, 2017: [Continue]
  • June 07, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • June 07, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
May, 2017
  • May 23, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • May 23, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
  • May 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 17, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 05, 2017: [Continue]
March, 2017
  • March 02, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 01, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Continue]
  • February 27, 2017: [Pre-Sentence Payment]
  • February 27, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 27, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • February 17, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • February 17, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • February 16, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • February 01, 2017: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • February 01, 2017: [Text Scheduling Order]
January, 2017
  • January 17, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 12, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 06, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
December, 2016
  • December 22, 2016: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • December 21, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 15, 2016: [Continue]
  • December 13, 2016: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 08, 2016: [Stipulation]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 28, 2016: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • November 28, 2016: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 14, 2016: [Draft Presentence Report]
October, 2016
  • October 24, 2016: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • October 21, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 21, 2016: [Order of Detention]
  • October 21, 2016: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 21, 2016: [Amended Plea Agreement]
  • October 21, 2016: [Consent]
  • October 21, 2016: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 06, 2016: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
August, 2016
  • August 30, 2016: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 26, 2016: [Consent]
  • August 26, 2016: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 19, 2016: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 19, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 19, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 19, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 15, 2016: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 12, 2016: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 12, 2016: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 12, 2016: [Statement of Factual Basis]
July, 2016
  • July 07, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • July 05, 2016: [Redacted Document]
  • July 05, 2016: [Order on Sealed Motion]
June, 2016
  • June 20, 2016: [Redacted Document]
  • June 20, 2016: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 03, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 03, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
May, 2016
  • May 27, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2016
  • April 18, 2016: [Order]
  • April 13, 2016: [Leave to]
  • April 11, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 04, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2016
  • March 29, 2016: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • March 24, 2016: [Request]
  • March 22, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 22, 2016: [Arrest]
  • March 14, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • March 14, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 14, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 14, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 14, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 14, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • March 14, 2016: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • March 11, 2016: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • March 11, 2016: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 11, 2016: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 09, 2016: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • March 09, 2016: [Bail Report]
  • March 08, 2016: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 08, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 08, 2016: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • March 07, 2016: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • March 03, 2016: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
February, 2016
  • February 26, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 26, 2016: [Arrest - Other District]
  • February 25, 2016: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • February 25, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 24, 2016: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • February 24, 2016: [Indictment / Information - Superseding - Redacted]
  • February 24, 2016: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • February 22, 2016: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • February 22, 2016: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 19, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 03, 2016: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 02, 2016: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 01, 2016: [Request]
  • February 01, 2016: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 01, 2016: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 01, 2016: [Invocation of Rights]
  • February 01, 2016: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 01, 2016: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 01, 2016: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 01, 2016: [Arraignment]
  • February 01, 2016: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 01, 2016: [Bail Report]
January, 2016
  • January 29, 2016: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 29, 2016: [Arrest]
  • January 29, 2016: [Case Unsealed]
  • January 29, 2016: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.