U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:06-cr-50023-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Running Horse
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
March, 2018
  • March 21, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • March 20, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • March 20, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 12, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 05, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 02, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • March 02, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 01, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 28, 2018: [Consent]
  • February 28, 2018: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • February 28, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 28, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • February 28, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 27, 2018: [Warrant Issued on Revocation]
  • February 27, 2018: [Order for Warrant - Probation Request]
  • February 27, 2018: [Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 27, 2018: [Request for Warrant]
September, 2017
  • September 11, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • September 05, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • September 01, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
August, 2017
  • August 28, 2017: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • August 21, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 21, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • August 18, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 18, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • August 18, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • August 18, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 18, 2017: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • August 18, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • August 18, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 02, 2017: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • August 02, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
July, 2017
  • July 27, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • July 26, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • July 17, 2017: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • July 14, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 13, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • July 13, 2017: [Consent]
  • July 13, 2017: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • July 13, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 12, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • July 12, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 12, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 12, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 12, 2017: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • July 11, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
February, 2016
  • February 01, 2016: [Add and Terminate Judges]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.